KY HB301 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 12 to specify that any active duty military personnel shall have any professional license or certificate renewed without payment of fees or obtaining continuing education as long as they are an active duty member of the Armed Forces and for six months after discharge; create a new section of KRS Chapter 12 to require that the professionally licensed or certified spouse of any active duty military personnel transferred to Kentucky shall be issued a six month temporary license by the administrative body with jurisdiction over that profession in Kentucky.
Title
AN ACT relating to professional licensure and certification.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Butler [R] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Tanya Pullin [D] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] |
Rep. Alecia Webb-Edgington [R] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-08 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-08 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-08 | received in House | |
2011-03-08 | passed 33-0 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate receded from Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-08 | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-08 | to Rules (S) | |
2011-03-04 | received in Senate | |
2011-03-04 | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | received in House | |
2011-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed 35-2 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-03 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2011 | |
2011-03-03 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill | |
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-18 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2011-02-16 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2011-02-11 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2011-02-10 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-10 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2011 | |
2011-02-10 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-09 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-04 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-03 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) | |
2011-02-02 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB301.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB301/bill.doc |