KY HB312 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 620.060 regarding emergency custody orders in dependency, neglect, and abuse cases to require a specific statement in the orders to change the educational enrollment of a protected child; amend KRS 403.730 to require a specific finding on the record before an emergency domestic violence protective order can order a child to change educational enrollment; amend KRS 403.270 regarding child custody generally to emphasize educational stability as a primary factor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to education stability for children.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-19Houseposted in committee
2019-02-12Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-02-11Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback