KY HB317 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - WITHDRAWN

Summary

Amend KRS 371.410 to decrease the percentage of retainage held from ten percent to five percent; require retainage to be held in escrow; require a 30-day time period for release after final completion; clarify required documentation; amend KRS 371.415 to create a rebuttable presumption of bad faith for failure to timely pay owed retainage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the retainage in construction contracts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-11 WITHDRAWN
2010-02-11 WITHDRAWN
2010-02-11 WITHDRAWN
2010-02-11 WITHDRAWN
2010-02-01 posted in committee
2010-01-26 to Labor & Industry (H)
2010-01-25 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback