KY HB317 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-07 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 367.409 to prohibit solicitation of any service relating to making a claim for basic reparation benefits, rather than related to a motor vehicle accident; clarify that emergency personnel are exempt if acting within the course and scope of their official duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to solicitation of an individual for a service related to a claim for basic reparation benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-07Senateto Judiciary (S)
2014-03-05Senatereceived in Senate
2014-03-04House3rd reading, passed 97-0
2014-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 4, 2014
2014-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2014-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2014-02-24Houseposted in committee
2014-02-04Houseto Judiciary (H)
2014-02-03Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback