KY HB318 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - returned to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - returned to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 262.850 to define "Agricultural land," "Agriculture," "Horticulture," "Aquaculture," "Livestock," and "Poultry"; include local Comprehensive Plans and 401 Facilities Plans when considering the formation of an agricultural district; require agricultural land to be used for agriculture for at least one year before being eligible to be in an agricultural district; require agricultural districts of less than 10 acres to have annual reviews and to comply with any necessary conservation plans; require the board to inform all members of agricultural districts that they must comply with KRS Chapter 132 in order to get an agricultural assessment on their property; make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to agricultural districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | returned to Agriculture (S) | |
2010-03-17 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-17 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-08 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2010-03-04 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2010-02-25 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2010 | |
2010-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-09 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-28 | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) | |
2010-01-26 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB318.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB318/bill.doc |