KY HB319 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 67C.115 to, in addition to allowing the metro council to retain its own legal counsel for advice and consultation, allow the metro council to otherwise employ legal counsel and staff for representation on all legal matters coming before the council.
Title
AN ACT relating to the usage of legal counsel by consolidated local government councils.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 190 (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 189 (Y: 33 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 189 (Y: 33 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | passed 72-22 |
2019-03-01 | House | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2019-03-01 | House | 3rd reading |
2019-02-28 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-13 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | introduced in House |