KY HB325 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 112)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 112)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.040 to make language gender equivalent.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1012 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 231 (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 231 (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 112) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | passed 37-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) withdrawn |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-12 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-4 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1), and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-04 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-13 | House | to State Government (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | introduced in House |