KY HB333 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establish Subchapter 13 of KRS Chapter 154 and create new sections thereof to define terms and create a tax credit for residents of the Commonwealth that are employed in high-skill, high-demand industry sector positions in an amount not to exceed $1,500 for each eligible position and a total of $3 million in each fiscal year; create a new section in KRS Chapter 141 to allow a nonrefundable, nontransferable tax credit against the individual income tax for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, but before January 1, 2024, and to require reporting by the department; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the tax credit; amend KRS 131.190 to conform to the reporting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the highly skilled employee tax credit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback