KY HB335 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 069)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 069)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 67.0802, relating to the disposition of county property, to define "independent appraisal" and to, in addition to the disposal methods available to counties, allow counties to transfer property for economic development purposes, trade property for the same or similar type of property, sell property without bids if the property is appraised for $5,000 or less, sell property as scraps or dispose of as garbage, which can include road millings and dirt, if the value of the property is no greater than nominal, or allow the Finance and Administration Cabinet to sell the property on behalf of the county; amend KRS 45A.425 to allow the provisions of Section 1 of the Act to be used in lieu of those set out in the local model procurement code for counties having adopted it.
Title
AN ACT relating to property owned by local governments and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 329 (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 2, sfta 1 RSN# 958 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 159 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 2, sfta 1 RSN# 958 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 159 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 069) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 91-8 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendments (2) and (1-title) |
2019-03-13 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendments (1-title) and (2) |
2019-03-13 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | received in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendments (1-title) and (2) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | floor amendment (1-title) and (2) filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2019-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-14 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | introduced in House |