KY HB337 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 64.012 to add affidavits of conversion or severance, assignments of release, and statements of authority as to real property to the list of filings with a specified fee; specify that the $10 permanent storage fee is to accrue throughout the county clerk's term; amend KRS 186A.298 and 273A.020 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to county clerk fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-01-31 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-30 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | introduced in House |