KY HB348 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 48.630 to prohibit the three branches of government from requesting an allotment of unbudgeted funds, except in the case of unbudgeted federal funds.
Title
AN ACT relating to unbudgeted federal funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Rudy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 13, 2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-11 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-31 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | introduced in House |