KY HB356 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 96)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 96)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
The Judicial Branch Budget: appropriate $476,780,400 in fiscal year 2020-2021 and $490,618,400 in fiscal year 2021-2022 from the General Fund, Restricted Funds, and Federal Funds; provide funds for defined calculations; provide funds for current position levels; provide funds for a 2.5% increase in each year of the biennium for all non-elected and elected personnel; provide that funds in the Court Operations and Administration appropriation unit carry forward; provide that if the Supreme Court retains the 2008 and 2018 increases in civil filing fees, the additional income, not to exceed $15,468,100 in each fiscal year, shall be deposited in a trust and agency account for court operations; provide funds to support use allowance, operating, and non-recurring furniture and equipment costs for two judicial center projects; provide funds to create a maintenance pool for planned and unanticipated non-capital projects for local courthouses and judicial centers; provide funds to compensate local units of government for providing court space and for costs incurred in the development of local court facilities; provide that funds in the Local Facilities Fund carry forward; provide that funds in the Local Facilities Use Allowance Contingency Fund carry forward; provide funds for actuarial-assessed judicial retirement benefits; provide for administrative expenses; provide General Fund support for use allowance payments for Jefferson County; defer General Fund support for operating costs, annualized use allowance payments, and nonrecurring furniture and equipment costs for Butler, Crittenden, Jessamine, Clinton, and Owsley Counties to the 2022-2024 fiscal biennium; authorize leases; clarify that nothing in this bill shall reduce funding of court facility projects authorized by the General Assembly; provide that if a court facility project is occupied and use allowance funding is insufficient that use allowance payments must be approved from the Local Facilities Use Allowance Contingency Fund, or if funds are not available in the Local Facilities Use Allowance Contingency Fund, the use allowance payments shall be deemed a necessary government expense; provide the Director of the Administrative Office of the Courts with expenditure authority; provide for severability of budget provisions; declare that KRS 48.312 controls duplicate appropriations; clarify that KRS 48.313 controls when a total or subtotal of the bill conflicts with a sum of the appropriations of which it consists; provide that any unexpended balance remaining in the Court's Restricted Funds or Federal Funds accounts carry forward; provide for the final budget document; provide for the transferability of funds; provide for appropriations revisions; provide that issuance of paychecks scheduled for June 30, 2020, June 30, 2021, and June 30, 2022, shall not be issued prior to July 1, 2020, July 1, 2021, and July 1, 2022; provide for participation in any Budget Reduction Plan or Surplus Expenditure Plan.
Title
AN ACT making appropriations for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the Judicial Branch of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky and its various officers, boards, commissions, subdivisions, and other state-supported activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 332 (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1424 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 256 (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 257 (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 256 (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1424 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 256 (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 257 (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 256 (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-16 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 96) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | line vetoes not acted upon |
2020-04-15 | Senate | posted for consideration of Governor's veto |
2020-04-15 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2020-04-14 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2020-04-14 | Senate | veto message received in House |
2020-04-13 | House | line items vetoed |
2020-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-01 | House | passed 88-2 |
2020-04-01 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-01 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-01 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-04-01 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-04-01 | House | received in House |
2020-04-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 1, 2020 |
2020-04-01 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-03-26 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-19 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 74-9 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendments (1) and (2) |
2020-03-18 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-17 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-03-17 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-12 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-12 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-29 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Court, Supreme
Courts
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Courts, Family
Judges and Court Commissioners
Judicial Circuits
Judicial Districts
State Agencies
State Employees
Budget and Financial Administration
Court, Supreme
Courts
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Courts, Family
Judges and Court Commissioners
Judicial Circuits
Judicial Districts
State Agencies
State Employees