KY HB360 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 39F.180 to require that any agency searching for a lost or missing person contact appropriate agencies within four hours of receiving the report and utilize existing resources, including but not limited to electronic highway signs, the Amber Alert system, law enforcement communication systems, electronic media, local, regional, and statewide media providers, and the Integrated Public Alert and Warning System, if authorized and under conditions permitted by the federal government.
Title
AN ACT relating to missing persons.
Sponsors
Rep. Deanna Frazier Gordon [R] | Rep. Daniel Elliott [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R] |
Rep. John Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 116 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 14, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-03 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Disabilities and the Disabled
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Mental Disability
News Media
Notices
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Safety
Sheriffs
Transportation
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Mental Disability
News Media
Notices
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Safety
Sheriffs
Transportation