KY HB365 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal and reenact KRS 217B.040 to define terms; repeal and reenact KRS 217B.140 to clarify the procedures for claims of, and investigations into, pesticide misuse by an applicator; repeal and reenact KRS 217B.500 to define terms; amend KRS 217B.505 to reduce the number of board members from seven to six on the Structural Pest Management Advisory Board; require that the board meet no less than two times per year; repeal and reenact KRS 217B.515 to establish the registration and examination requirements for any person engaging in structural pest management or structural fumigation; specify licensing requirements for any persons holding only a termite or general pest control license or a fumigation license; establish that licenses shall expire annually; authorize the department to promulgate administrative regulations relating to structural pest management and structural fumigation; allow the department to assess fees for such licenses and costs related to the administration of examinations; amend various sections of KRS Chapter 217B to remove limitations on fees for pesticide-related licenses and make technical corrections; remove the requirement that pesticide-related license applications must include details of any equipment used by the applicant to apply pesticides; remove set fees for pesticide operator licenses; remove the set fees for pesticide application licenses; authorize the Department of Agriculture to set fees for noncommercial licenses; authorize the department to issue noncommercial applicator licenses to, and waive fees for, qualifying prison inmates and other incarcerated persons; remove the specific amount for pesticide dealer registration fees and annual renewal fees; remove the specific amount for pesticide dealer branch office registration fees and annual renewal fees; specify violations for which the department may assess civil penalties; specify eligibility requirements for commercial licensing, noncommercial licensing, dealer registration, or structural pest management company registration provisions shall not apply; remove the specific amount for pesticide sales agent license registration fees and annual renewal fees; remove the specific amount for pesticide applicator trainee registration fees; authorize the department to promulgate administrative regulations for the regulation of pesticides sold and used in the Commonwealth; establish the powers and duties of the board; specify the requirements for applicants for an operator’s license; specify examination requirements for commercial structural pest management operator examinations; remove the specific amount for examination fees; authorize the department to promulgate administrative regulations for license testing fees; specify requirements of operator license holders; require structural pest management companies and employers of noncommercial applicators to register annually and pay a fee for each office; require nonresident operators, applicators, and structural pest management companies to designate a resident agent upon whom service of process may be made to enforce the provisions of KRS 217B.515 to KRS 217B.585; specify violations of KRS 217B.515 to KRS 217B.585 for which the department may assess civil penalties; require structural pest management companies to register trainees with the department; authorize the department to promulgate administrative regulations to establish additional requirements for trainees and a fee for registration; authorize the department to promulgate administrative regulations on the identification of vehicles utilized by structural pest management companies; establish that each structural management company and employer of a non-commercial applicator shall be responsible for the actions of its employees or agents in performing structural pest management services; specify actions for an injunction against any person violating or threatening to violate provisions of KRS Chapter 217B or any administrative regulation; establish penalties for offenses; create a new section of KRS Chapter 217B to establish liability insurance requirements for structural pest management companies; create a new section of KRS Chapter 217B to prohibit local regulation of pesticides; repeal KRS 217B.100; 217B.103; 217B.170; 217B.260; 217B.300; 217B.320; and 217B.575.
Title
AN ACT relating to fertilizer and pesticide use and application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-05 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2020-02-03 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Agriculture
Attorney General
Fiscal Note
Hazardous Materials
Licensing
Local Government
Occupations and Professions
Pollution
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Agriculture
Attorney General
Fiscal Note
Hazardous Materials
Licensing
Local Government
Occupations and Professions
Pollution