KY HB367 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - recommitted to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - recommitted to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 64 to define "elected official"; establish that a statutory fee amount for services performed by elected officials or their offices be considered the maximum fee amount; allow the elected official to charge a lower fee amount when the maximum fee amount is not necessary for funding purposes; require a schedule of current fee rates to be posted and records of historical fee rates when the elected official charges a lower fee amount.
Title
AN ACT relating to fees that are established for services provided by elected officials.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad McCoy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | recommitted to Local Government (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-05 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-02-03 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Attorney, County
Audits and Auditors
Cities
Constables
Coroners
Counties
County Clerks
County Judges/Executive
County Surveyors
Fees
Jails and Jailers
Justices of the Peace and Magistrates
Local Mandate
Property Valuation Administrators
Sheriffs
Audits and Auditors
Cities
Constables
Coroners
Counties
County Clerks
County Judges/Executive
County Surveyors
Fees
Jails and Jailers
Justices of the Peace and Magistrates
Local Mandate
Property Valuation Administrators
Sheriffs