KY HB381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch.127)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch.127)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to define "postsecondary institution" and "police officer"; provide that postsecondary institutions may employ retired police officers provided the officer was a police officer at retirement, retired with at least 20 years of service credit with no administrative charges pending, and met the separation of employment requirements so that retirement benefits from Kentucky Retirement Systems were not voided; provide that retired police officers employed by a postsecondary institution shall continue to receive the benefits they were eligible to receive upon retirement, but shall not accrue any additional retirement or health benefits during reemployment; provide that retirement and any health contributions shall not be paid by the postsecondary institution to Kentucky Retirement Systems or the Kentucky Employees Health Plan on a retired officer who is reemployed under the section; provide that individuals employed under the section may be employed for a term not to exceed one year, which may be renewed at the discretion and need of the postsecondary institution; limit number reemployed under the program to greater of 5 officers or 25% of the university police force in 2018; amend KRS 61.637 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to the reemployment of retired police officers by a postsecondary institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1050 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 167 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 167 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch.127) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-03-04 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2019-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-15 | House | to State Government (H) |
2019-02-14 | House | introduced in House |