KY HB382 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 070)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 304.42-030 to add coverage for health maintenance organization contracts to the Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act; add health care providers rendering services covered under a health insurance policy, contract, or certificate as a beneficiary entitled to coverage; exempt structured settlement factoring transactions and Medicaid policies or contracts from coverage under the subtitle; exempt long-term care or any other health insurance benefits from interest rate coverage exemption; establish a limitation on coverage provided for long-term care riders to a life insurance policy or annuity contract; amend KRS 304.42-050 to conform and add definition for "health benefit plan;" amend KRS 304.42-060 to add health maintenance organizations as members of the Kentucky Life and Health Guaranty Association; amend KRS 304.42-080 to conform and permit the association to reissue policies and contracts of impaired insurers; offer substitute coverage at actuarially justified rates; amend KRS 304.42-090 to conform and make revisions to the assessment requirements; amend KRS 304.42-130 to permit member insurers that are exempt from certain taxes to impose a surcharge to recoup assessments levied; amend KRS 304.42-020, 304.42-110, 304.42-120, 304.42-140, and 304.42-190 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 965 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 201 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 070)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-13Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-13Housereceived in House
2019-03-13Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-13Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2019-03-06Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-01House3rd reading, passed 97-0
2019-02-28Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019
2019-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-19Houseposted in committee
2019-02-15Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2019-02-14Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback