KY HB383 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 325.240 to give the State Board of Accountancy the authority to establish a scholarship program; grant the board immunity from being sued when members act in good faith; amend KRS 325.280 to allow CPAs from other states who did not obtain a license in their home state within five years of passing the CPA exam to get a Kentucky license.
Title
AN ACT relating to CPA licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 196 (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 85-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-07 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-02-05 | House | introduced in House |