KY HB389 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.17A-611 to prohibit insurers from requiring or using certain utilization reviews for certain prescription drugs used to treat alcohol or opioid use disorder; amend KRS 205.536 to prohibit the Department for Medicaid Services or a Medicaid- managed care organization from requiring or using certain utilization reviews for certain prescription drugs used to treat alcohol or opioid use disorder; effective January 1, 2021.
Title
AN ACT relating to utilization reviews.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-10 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Alcoholism
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Fiscal Note
Insurance, Health
Medicaid
Public Medical Assistance
State Agencies
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Fiscal Note
Insurance, Health
Medicaid
Public Medical Assistance
State Agencies
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb389.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb389/orig_bill.pdf |