KY HB39 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
Pending: House Economic Development & Workforce Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
Pending: House Economic Development & Workforce Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 337.010 to increase the applicable threshold of employees of retail stores and service industries from $95,000 to $500,000 average annual gross volume of sales for the employer; amend KRS 337.275 to raise the state minimum wage to $8.20 per hour on July 1, 2020, $9.15 per hour on July 1, 2021, $10.10 per hour on July 1, 2022, $11 per hour on July 1, 2023, $12.05 per hour on July 1, 2024, $13.10 per hour on July 1, 2025, $13.95 per hour on July 1, 2026, and $15 per hour on July 1, 2027, and to raise the state minimum wage for tipped employees to $2.13 per hour on the effective date of the Act, $3.05 per hour on July 1, 2021, $3.95 per hour on July 1, 2022, and $4.90 per hour on July 1, 2023; include anti-preemption language permitting local governments to establish minimum wage ordinances in excess of the state minimum wage.
Title
AN ACT relating to wages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-08-21 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb39.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb39/orig_bill.pdf |