KY HB390 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 337.015 to require employers provide the same leave policies to adoptive parents as they provide to birth parents; change the applicable age of an adoptive child from seven to ten; create an exemption for specified categories of adoption.
Title
AN ACT related to adoption leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 159 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Senate | recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-17 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-10 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | introduced in House |