KY HB391 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 213.101, relating to abortion reporting requirements, to allow the Auditor of Public Accounts to perform an annual audit.
Title
AN ACT relating to the reporting of abortion related information to the Vital Statistics Branch.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Lee [R] | Rep. Joseph Fischer [R] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] |
Rep. Daniel Elliott [R] | Rep. Robert Goforth [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Thomas Huff [R] |
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] | Rep. Nancy Tate [R] |
Rep. Russell Webber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-05 | House | floor amendments (1), (2), (3), (4), (5), (6) and (7) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-25 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-10 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | introduced in House |