KY HB393 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 179)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 179)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 39G.010 to require the Kentucky Office of Homeland Security to create the Commonwealth Activity Taxonomy System (CATS) Committee to develop and oversee a system of evaluating special events to determine, plan, mitigate, and respond to risks and threats to the Commonwealth.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Office of Homeland Security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1029 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 202 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 202 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 179) |
2019-03-26 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-06 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2019-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-19 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2019-02-15 | House | introduced in House |