KY HB397 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 164)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 164)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 64.090 to require sheriffs and constables to charge and collect a fee of $60 from any person requesting the service of the sheriff or constable, but not on behalf of the commonwealth, or any of its agencies or the State Police, for the services provided in the statute where a percentage, commission, or reasonable fee is not otherwise allowed; make all fees charged and collected subject to monthly reporting to the county and subject to audit.
Title
AN ACT relating to county sheriffs' fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 357 (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1005 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 203 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1005 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 203 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 164) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 78-12 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2019-03-12 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2019-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-19 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-15 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Attorneys
Cities
Civil Actions
Constables
Counties
Fees
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Sheriffs
Cities
Civil Actions
Constables
Counties
Fees
Local Government
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Sheriffs