KY HB397 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 337 to provide definitions; set forth determination of misclassified workers; set forth investigation process and violations; establish court remedies; require notice by an employer; grant the commissioner of the Department of Workplace Standards authority to promulgate administrative regulations; require agencies to share the information of a misclassifying employer to other interested state agencies; amend KRS 337.990 to establish penalties for violations; amend KRS 45A.145 to prohibit contractors with multiple violations from contracting with the state for five years; amend KRS 131.190 to require the Department of Revenue to provide copies of orders to three other state agencies; create a new section of KRS Chapter 341 to require the Office of Unemployment Insurance to provide copies of orders to three other state agencies; create a new section of KRS Chapter 342 to require the commissioner of the Department of Workers' Claims to provide copies to three other state agencies; state that certain sections of the bill may be cited as the Kentucky Workers Fairness Act; Sections 1 to 13, 15, and 16 EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.
Title
AN ACT creating the Classification of Workers in the Construction Industry Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 291 (Y: 70 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 70-14 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-10 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Effective Dates, Delayed
Labor and Industry
Occupations and Professions
Personnel and Employment
Short Titles and Popular Names
State Agencies
Unemployment Compensation
Wages and Hours
Workers' Compensation
Effective Dates, Delayed
Labor and Industry
Occupations and Professions
Personnel and Employment
Short Titles and Popular Names
State Agencies
Unemployment Compensation
Wages and Hours
Workers' Compensation