KY HB4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - delivered to Secretary of State (KY Acts ch. 192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - delivered to Secretary of State (KY Acts ch. 192)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 13A to be numbered as KRS 13A.336 to require the staff of the Administrative Regulation Review Subcommittee to submit to that committee's co-chairs an annual report on administrative regulations found deficient by a legislative committee; list the information that is necessary to complete the report; include prominent text on the first page of the report outlining potential legislative options; amend KRS 13A.190 to make an emergency administrative regulation expire after 240 days; allow an administrative body that extends the time for filing a statement of consideration to postpone the expiration beyond 240 days for a number of days equal to the extension; amend KRS 13A.290 to allow a committee to take action on an administrative regulation within 90 days of LRC referral; permit an administrative regulation to transfer between standing committees and an interim joint committee or vice versa if a session of the General Assembly occurs during part of the 90-day review period; amend KRS 13A.330 to merge administrative regulation deficiency processes and to conform; amend KRS 13A.331 to combine administrative regulation adoption processes and to conform; amend KRS 13A.300, 13A.310, 13A.315, and 13A.335 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to administrative regulations.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Upchurch [R] | Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] | Rep. Chad McCoy [R] |
Rep. David Meade [R] | Rep. Suzanne Miles [R] | Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1131 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 396 (Y: 58 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 328 (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 955 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 132 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 396 (Y: 58 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 328 (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 955 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 132 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (KY Acts ch. 192) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | received in House |
2019-03-28 | House | passed 28-9 |
2019-03-28 | House | veto overridden |
2019-03-28 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2019-03-28 | House | received in Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | passed 58-27 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | veto overridden |
2019-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2019-03-28 | Senate | received in House |
2019-03-26 | House | Vetoed |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 61-36 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-13 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-13 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | received in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2019-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-07 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Committees
General Assembly
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies
Committees
General Assembly
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies