KY HB4 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 120 to provide for an automatic recount in elections of constitutional officers, members of Congress, and members of the General Assembly when the vote margin is 0.5% or less; amend KRS 118.775 relating to membership in the General Assembly to conform; amend KRS 120.185 to provide for a recount in elections of the Governor and Lieutenant Governor, members of Congress, and members of the General Assembly when an automatic recount does not apply; amend KRS 120.195, 120.205, and 120.215 to establish procedures for any election contest involving the Governor and Lieutenant Governor and members of the General Assembly, including a mechanism to ensure the integrity of the election records and a chain of custody of election records if transported; provide who shall conduct a recount as part of an election contest and the procedures to be followed; provide the time frame for a newly ordered election; amend KRS 117.295, 118.740, 120.017, and 120.155 to conform; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 287 (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-03-26 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-19 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 82-2 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Agriculture
Appropriations
Attorney General
Auditor of Public Accounts
County Clerks
Elections and Voting
General Assembly
Governor
Lieutenant Governor
Local Mandate
Secretary of State
State Agencies
Treasurer
Appropriations
Attorney General
Auditor of Public Accounts
County Clerks
Elections and Voting
General Assembly
Governor
Lieutenant Governor
Local Mandate
Secretary of State
State Agencies
Treasurer