KY HB402 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 161.605 to provide that breaks in service are required before returning to work for the employer even if in a position not covered by the Teachers’ Retirement System (TRS); begin running of breaks in service from date of retirement; prohibit prearranged agreements between a retiring member and employer for member to return to work after retirement and require certification thereof; require retired members returning to work for state-supported universities and community colleges to comply with the separation-from-service requirements; amend KRS 161.612 to reduce the $500 minimum monthly disability benefit by benefit payments from all state-administered retirement systems for part-time employees and substitute teachers participating in the TRS who apply for disability benefits on or after July 1, 2020, and provide that part-time employees and substitute teachers are not eligible to apply for a disability retirement allowance if they are eligible for an unreduced retirement benefit; amend KRS 161.661 to provide that members who begin participating on or after July 1, 2020, shall not be eligible for a disability benefit if they are eligible for any unreduced benefit and that they shall have their $500 minimum monthly disability benefit reduced by benefit payments from all state-administered retirement systems; make conforming and technical changes; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Teachers' Retirement System and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 147 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 |
2020-02-19 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-10 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-02-07 | House | introduced in House |