KY HB403 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 278.287 to change the eligibility threshold for participation in a voluntary energy cost assistance fund from 110% of the federal poverty guidelines to the percentage of the federal poverty guidelines required for eligibility in the subsidy component of the Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program (LIHEAP).
Title
AN ACT relating to voluntary energy cost assistance funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 184 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-03-18 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2020-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-10 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2020-02-07 | House | introduced in House |