KY HB409 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 100.324 to allow a planning commission the power to delegate the review of public facilities projects to an officer or staff of the commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the review of local government land uses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-28Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019
2019-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-22Houseposted in committee
2019-02-20Houseto Local Government (H)
2019-02-19Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback