KY HB410 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 431.066, relating to pretrial release and bail options, to define "administratively released," "danger to others," and "financial condition of release"; require pretrial services to provide a defendant's juvenile court history when the defendant is 23 or under; require pretrial services, if requested by the court, to provide the defendant's juvenile court history when the defendant is over 23; specify that a court may impose a financial condition of release if the court finds by a preponderance of the evidence that the defendant constitutes a risk of failing to appear or danger to others; provide that a defendant is not eligible for bail credits if the court finds by clear and convincing evidence that the defendant constitutes a risk of failing to appear or danger to others; amend KRS 431.520, relating to conditions of release, to conform and to outline the hearing process for when a person continues to be detained as a result of his or her inability to meet a financial condition of release; amend KRS 218A.135, 222.204, 431.525, and 610.340 to conform; amend KRS 67.372 and 431.517 to require counties to pay global positioning monitoring system fees for those on pretrial release who are at or below 200% of the federal poverty guidelines; repeal KRS 431.540, relating to a schedule of bail amounts.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-12 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Bail and Pretrial Release
Corrections Impact
Counties
Courts
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Local Mandate
Corrections Impact
Counties
Courts
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Local Mandate