KY HB411 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 145)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 145)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 383.085, relating to reasonable accommodations for assistance animals in housing, to specify with whom a person with a disability can be in a therapeutic relationship; add instances that qualify as the prohibited act of misrepresentation of an assistance animal; allow a lessor to recover a fee upon the misrepresentation of an assistance animal by a lessee.
Title
AN ACT relating to assistance animals.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Koenig [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 323 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 943 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 935 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 205 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 943 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 935 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 205 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 145) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | passed 94-1 |
2019-03-13 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-13 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-13 | House | taken from Rules |
2019-03-12 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | received in House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-03-04 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-20 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | introduced in House |