KY HB411 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 119)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 119)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186A.120, regarding notation of security interest on a certificate of title, to establish that the county of residence designated by the debtor shall be relied upon in the titling process and that reliance shall relieve motor vehicle dealers, assignee lenders, secured parties, and county clerks from liability from third parties; establish when a security interest is deemed to be perfected; amend KRS 186A.195 and 186A.200 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to security interests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1492 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 163 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 163 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 119) |
2020-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-15 | House | received in House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2020-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 15, 2020 |
2020-04-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | recommitted to Transportation (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-20 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-12 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2020-02-10 | House | introduced in House |