KY HB417 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 50)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 304.5-140 to define "reciprocal jurisdiction" and "covered agreement"; establish requirements for certain reinsurance arrangements; require the commissioner to publish a list of reciprocal jurisdictions and assuming insurers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to credit for reinsurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1401 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 162 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Housesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 50)
2020-03-19Housedelivered to Governor
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-19Housereceived in House
2020-03-19Senate3rd reading, passed 31-0
2020-03-19Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-17Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2020-03-05Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2020-03-03Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-02House3rd reading, passed 93-0
2020-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 28, 2020
2020-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-18Houseposted in committee
2020-02-14Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2020-02-12Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback