KY HB426 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.075 to specify that any city or county other than a consolidated local government or an urban-county government may impose a regulatory licensing fee on alcohol, and create a two-year period for a city or county who would have been allowed to impose a fee to do so.
Title
AN ACT relating to alcohol local regulatory licensing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 206 (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-03-18 | Senate | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-5 with floor amendment (2) |
2020-03-06 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2020-03-05 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-18 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | introduced in House |