KY HB434 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require each school district to utilize a mental health assessment as needed for students and contract with a student mental health assessment provider; require the Kentucky Department of Education to disburse funds appropriated by the General Assembly to school districts for the contract cost subject to a maximum amount determined by the department; appropriate $4 million in each year of the 2020-2022 biennium; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to student mental health assessments and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Banta [R] | Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D] | Rep. Samara Heavrin [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Steve Riley [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-20 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | introduced in House |