KY HB44 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 12)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 12)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 511.100 to change the definition of "key infrastructure assets" to specify that natural gas or petroleum pipelines are the type of pipelines covered in the definition and include other types of infrastructure assets; amend KRS 512.020 to include tampering with, impeding, or inhibiting operations of a key infrastructure asset in the offense of criminal mischief in the first degree; create a new section of KRS 411 that a civil action may be maintained against a person that compensates or remunerates a person to violate KRS 512.020 and the compensated person is convicted of criminal mischief in the first degree.
Title
AN ACT relating to key infrastructure assets.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. Randy Bridges [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1286 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 91 (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 91 (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 12) |
2020-03-09 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-09 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-06 | House | received in House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-4 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 71-17 with floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-02-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 7, 2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-01-31 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-30 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-08-29 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Energy
Local Mandate
Oil and Natural Gas
Public Utilities
Telecommunications
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Energy
Local Mandate
Oil and Natural Gas
Public Utilities
Telecommunications