KY HB454 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 142)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 142)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 311.710 to 311.820 to prohibit an abortion on a pregnant woman that will result in the bodily dismemberment, crushing, or human vivisection of the unborn child when the probable post-fertilization age of the unborn child is 11 weeks or greater, except in the case of a medical emergency; amend KRS 311.990 to provide that a person who violates the prohibition is guilty of a Class D felony; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the human rights of unborn children and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 419 (Y: 75 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 617 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 617 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 270 (Y: 71 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 617 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 617 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 270 (Y: 71 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 142) |
2018-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-27 | House | passed 75-13 |
2018-03-27 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-27 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-27 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-5 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2018-03-21 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | passed 71-11 |
2018-03-12 | House | floor amendment (1) ruled out of order |
2018-03-12 | House | 3rd reading |
2018-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 12, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-07 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-26 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-02-22 | House | introduced in House |