KY HB466 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.174 to establish the application procedures and fees for a personalized license plate; establish when a personalized plate shall not be issued.
Title
AN ACT relating to the issuance of a personalized license plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 198 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-03-18 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-24 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | introduced in House |