KY HB467 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 198B.060 to allow local plan review of educational facilities.
Title
AN ACT relating to the construction of educational facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 294 (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-3 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-24 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Cities
Counties
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Housing, Building, and Construction
Local Government
Public Buildings and Grounds
Counties
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Housing, Building, and Construction
Local Government
Public Buildings and Grounds