KY HB470 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 130)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 130)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 217.186 to allow a pharmacist to dispense naloxone to a person or agency who provides training on the use of naloxone as a part of a harm reduction program; amend KRS 218A.1412 to make a technical correction to clarify that heroin trafficking is not eligible for a Class D felony; amend KRS 507.040 to add the unlawful distribution for remuneration of a Schedule I or II drug where the drug is the proximate cause of death to the elements of manslaughter in the second degree.
Title
AN ACT relating to controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1056 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 230 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 230 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 130) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2019-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-21 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Drugs and Medicines
Local Mandate
Pharmacists
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Drugs and Medicines
Local Mandate
Pharmacists