KY HB485 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.365 to add officers of the United States Fish and Wildlife Service to the list of federal employees who are deemed to be peace officers; amend KRS 150.160 to divert $10 to the fish and game fund from each assessment of court costs when the court imposes no fine for a violation of KRS Chapter 150 or 235; amend KRS to clarify the terms of taxidermist license; amend KRS 150.175 to increase penalties for violating hunting and fishing related statutes; amend KRS 235.990 to allow collection of penalty and imprisonment for violations of KRS 235.240(2), relating to operation of watercraft and water skis under the influence of substances; amend KRS 150.460 to conform; APPROPRIATIONS.
Title
AN ACT relating to enforcement and shared enforcement of Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources with Kentucky Department of Agriculture and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 259 (Y: 71 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 71-11 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-18 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-18 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Rules |
2020-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-27 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2020-02-25 | House | introduced in House |