KY HB496 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 333.150 to permit a patient to request and receive results of his or her genetic or genetic-related tests; require results of genetic or genetic-related tests to be reported and transmitted to a patient who requested the test; amend KRS 333.160 to permit a medical laboratory to collect a specimen from a patient for a genetic or genetic-related test requested by the patient.
Title
AN ACT relating to genetic and genetic-related medical testing.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad McCoy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 296 (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 78-6 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-28 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | introduced in House |