KY HB508 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (6-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (6-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 161 to establish the Educators Employment Liability Insurance Program for certified employees of public schools; require the Department of Education to promulgate administrative regulations to implement the program; appropriate $7,000,000 for the program for fiscal year 2019-2020; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Educators Employment Liability Insurance Program, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (6-title) filed |
2019-02-28 | House | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-27 | House | floor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-21 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Insurance
Teachers
Appropriations
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Insurance
Teachers