KY HB575 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 367 to define "energy source" and "utility service"; provide that the right of an individual customer to use any utility service shall not be infringed due to the energy source of the utility service to be delivered.
Title
AN ACT relating to utility service.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Suzanne Miles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-03 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |