KY HB593 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 217.005 to 217.215 to establish labeling requirements for cannabidiol products.
Title
AN ACT relating to cannabidiol products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 303 (Y: 44 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 44-40 |
2020-03-19 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |