KY HB6 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - floor amendment (8) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (7) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - floor amendment (8) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (7) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.0305 to make the hours and days of operation for a souvenir retail liquor licensee subject to local ordinance; amend KRS 243.130, 243.154, and 243.170 to allow manufacturers, small farm winery wholesalers, and wholesalers to distribute wine or distilled spirits under a sampling license; amend KRS 244.050 to allow retail drink, retail package, and souvenir retail liquor licensees to give a customer 3 distilled spirit samples per day rather than 2 samples under a sampling license; permit a licensed distiller, wholesaler, small farm winery, or small farm winery wholesaler to acquire a sampling license; limit these sampling licensees to providing the standard size and number of complimentary samples of distilled spirits or wine per day to each customer during regular business hours at a retailer's licensed premises; authorize the sampling licensee or its agents, servants, or employees to address the customer and pour and serve samples at the retailer's premises; require retail licensees to sell the distilled spirits used for a complimentary sampling event at no more than the retail licensee's normal selling price; permit the retail licensee to bill on a per-event basis in the usual course of business; prohibit a distiller from using its sampling license on its distillery premises unless it also holds a souvenir retail liquor license; prohibit a wholesaler, small farm winery, or small farm winery wholesaler from using its sampling license at its business premises if the premises is located in a dry territory; preclude a distiller, wholesaler, small farm winery, or small farm winery wholesaler sampling licensee from concurrently holding a distilled spirits sampling event and a wine sampling event at the same premises unless the Department for Alcoholic Beverage Control has approved the event in advance; authorize distiller licensees to give a consumer who is touring the distillery for educational purposes one complimentary sample of up to 1/2 ounce of un-aged product manufactured at the distillery premises; enable distiller, wholesaler, small farm winery, or small farm winery wholesaler sampling licensees to offer consumers branded nonalcoholic promotional items of nominal value in conjunction with a distillery or winery tour or a complimentary sampling event; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to promotional sampling of distilled spirits and wine and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | floor amendment (8) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (7) filed | |
2010-05-26 | defeated 43-51 | |
2010-05-26 | floor amendment (1) adopted | |
2010-05-26 | floor amendment (2) defeated | |
2010-05-26 | floor amendment (4) ruled out of order | |
2010-05-26 | 3rd reading | |
2010-05-26 | floor amendment (6) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-05-25 | floor amendments (3) (4) and (5) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-05-25 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed | |
2010-05-25 | placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, May 26, 2010 | |
2010-05-25 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2010-05-24 | posting waived | |
2010-05-24 | returned to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2010-05-24 | 1st reading | |
2010-05-24 | taken from Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2010-05-24 | to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2010-05-24 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10SS/HB6.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10SS/HB6/bill.doc |