KY HB623 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require that an individual on school district property provide government-issued photo identification if requested by a school employee, school resource officer, or law enforcement officer; provide that the individual may be required to leave the property if they refuse or are unable to comply; amend KRS 511.070, relating to criminal trespass in the second degree, to make trespassing in a school building or upon school premises to which notice against trespass is given a Class A misdemeanor; amend KRS 511.080, relating to criminal trespass in the third degree, to make trespassing upon school premises a Class B misdemeanor; amend KRS 511.090 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to school safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-03-09 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Local Mandate
Safety
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Local Mandate
Safety