KY HB631 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 15.440 to allow the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council to approve basic training credit for police officers seeking certification who meet certain experience and training levels.
Title
AN ACT relating to peace officer certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 307 (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-1 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |