KY HB64 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch.185)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 217.215 to permit pharmacists to dispense a prescription refill in an amount equal to the standard unit of dispensing for the drug without authorization by the prescribing practitioner in emergency situations in which such authorization may not be readily or easily obtained; require the Board of Pharmacy to promulgate administrative regulations to carry out these provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to pharmacists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1016 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 77 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch.185)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-07Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-07Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2019-03-05Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2019-03-05Senate1st reading
2019-03-05Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2019-02-27Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2019-02-21Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-20House3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-15Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019
2019-02-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-12Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-10-09HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback